Global Patent Index - EP 1074192 A1

EP 1074192 A1 2001-02-07 - Process for manufacturing a three dimensional object made from pieces

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing a three dimensional object made from pieces

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines, aus Stücken gebildeten, dreidimensionalen Artikels

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réaliser un objet tridimensionnel forme de pièces

Publication

EP 1074192 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402215 A

Priority

FR 9910135 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a method for producing, on a deformable strip, a three-dimensional object formed with parts, characterised in that it comprises the following steps: producing a three-dimensional model having the shape of the object to be produced (Fig. 1); positioning and/or drawing the shape and colours of the patterns on the three-dimensional module (Fig. 3); disassembling the model so as to separate the model parts forming it (Fig. 4); levelling the model parts provided with pattern(s) or pattern part(s) (Fig. 5); obtaining a two-dimensional image of the model parts and a two-dimensional image of the patterns; printing the two dimensional image of the patterns on the strip. The strip is cut out in accordance with the image of the model parts. The patterns are produced continuous over at least two adjacent parts without any detectable break or mismatch in shape and colour.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé pour réaliser, sur une bande déformable un objet tridimensionnel formé de pièces, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend les étapes de: réalisation d'un modèle tridimensionnel ayant la forme de l'objet à obtenir (fig.1); positionnement et/ou dessin de la forme et du coloris des motifs sur le modèle tridimensionnel (fig.3); démontage du modèle de manière à séparer les pièces modèles le constituant (fig.4); mise à plat des pièces modèles ainsi pourvues de motif(s) ou partie(s) de motif (fig.5); obtention d'une image bidimensionnelle des pièces modèles et d'une image bidimensionnelle des motifs; impression de l'image bidimensionnelle des motifs sur la bande; La bande est découpée conformément à l'image des pièces modèles. Les motifs viennent en continuation sur au moins deux pièces adjacentes sans interruption ou décalage décelable de forme et de coloris. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 3/00; A41H 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 3/00 (2006.01); A41H 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41H 3/007 (2013.01); A41H 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074192 A1 20010207; AU 6849200 A 20010305; FR 2797155 A1 20010209; FR 2797155 B1 20010921; WO 0110256 A1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI