Global Patent Index - EP 1074197 A1

EP 1074197 A1 2001-02-07 - Device for wearing preferably around the wrist provided with a folding clasp fastener

Title (en)

Device for wearing preferably around the wrist provided with a folding clasp fastener

Title (de)

Eine bevorzugt am Handgelenk zu tragende, in sich umfangmässig geschlossene Anordnung mit einem Umlegeverschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif à porter de préférence autour du poignet pourvu d'un fermoir pliant

Publication

EP 1074197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810699 A

Priority

  • EP 00810699 A
  • EP 99810691 A

Abstract (en)

The bracelet (7a,b) has a fold-over locket (1) to extends its circumference, with central lock part (3) and toggle levers (11a,b) at the end. Each toggle lever is also connected to a bracelet end (5a,b). The foldable levers and the central lock part are formed and connected to each other in such a way, that during the movement from closed to open condition, the central lock part is moved in an outward direction.

Abstract (de)

Eine bevorzugt am Handgelenk zu tragende, in sich umfangmäßig geschlossene Anordnung hat ein Armband (7a, 7b) und einen zur Umfangsweitenänderung der Anordnung dienenden Umlegeverschluss (1). Der Umlegeverschluss (1) hat einen zentralen Verschlussteil (3) und wenigstens einen mit diesem in seinem einen Endbereich verbundenen Kniehebel (11a, 11b), an dessen anderen Endbereich ein Armbandende (5a, 5b) befestigt ist. Der jeweils mit dem Armbandende (5a, 5b) verbundene, zum zentralen Verschlussteil (3) umfangmäßig versetzte, zusammenklappbare Kniehebel (11a, 11b) und der zentrale Verschlussteil (3) sind derart ausgebildet und miteinander verbunden, dass beim unmittelbaren Übergang vom geschlossenen Zustand des Umlegeverschlusses (1) zum offenen Zustand der zentrale Verschlussteil (3) nach aussen zu bewegen ist. Diese Anordnung ist erstens in einem umfangverkürzten Zustand durch den Umlegeverschluss sicher geschlossen, zweitens zur Umfangvergrößerung auf einfache Art und Weise aufmachbar und hat drittens insbesondere im geschlossenen Zustand ein ästhetisch schönes Erscheinungsbild. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074197 A1 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034651

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONTRES ANTIMA S.A.

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI