Global Patent Index - EP 1074202 A1

EP 1074202 A1 2001-02-07 - Seating furniture

Title (en)

Seating furniture

Title (de)

Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble pour s'asseoir

Publication

EP 1074202 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116066 A

Priority

DE 29913405 U

Abstract (en)

The seat frame (3) has a tip axis (K) in its central area between the back rest (4) and the front side termination (8) of the frame and a lever arrangement (9) of the elbow lever type in the area near to the back rest. The lever arrangement has at least one lever arm (10) articulatedly connected with the seat frame. The lever arrangement has two lever arms (10,11). The arm (10) linked to the seat frame at its free end in relation to the linkage with the seat frame is linked to the furniture frame via a further lever arm (11).

Abstract (de)

Ein Sitzmöbel mit einer an einem bezüglich seiner Neigung veränderbaren Sitzrahmen 3 angelenkten und gegenüber dem Sitzrahmen 3 verschwenkbaren Rückenlehne 4, ist dadurch bestimmt, daß der Sitzrahmen 3 über eine in seinem mittleren Bereich zwischen der Rückenlehne 4 und dem vorderseitigen Abschluß 8 des Sitzrahmens 3 angeordnete Kippachse K und über eine im Rückenlehnen nahen Bereich angeordnete nach Art eines Kniehebels wirkende Hebelanordnung 9, umfassend zumindest einen gelenkig mit dem Sitzrahmen 3 verbundenen Hebelarm 10 am Gestell des Sitzmöbels 1 zwischen der durch die gelenkige Verbindung zwischen dem Sitzrahmen 3 und dem zumindest einen Hebelarm 10 gebildeten Gelenkachse G1 und der Kippachse K abgestützt ist und daß die Rückenlehne 4 an dem zumindest einen Hebelarm 10 der Hebelanordnung 9 befestigt und somit entsprechend dem zumindest einen Hebelarm 10 gegenüber dem Sitzrahmen 3 verschwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A47C 1/034

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 1/034 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/0342 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29600282 U1 19960229 - STELTEMEIER JOSEF GMBH [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913405 U1 19991111; AT 255833 T 20031215; DK 1074202 T3 20040413; EP 1074202 A1 20010207; EP 1074202 B1 20031210; ES 2209727 T3 20040701; PT 1074202 E 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-02-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HE-KO GBR (VERTRETUNGSBERECHTIGTE GESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BACKHAUS, MARTIN, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BACKHAUS, MARTIN, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120202

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090728

2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090728

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOSEF *STELTEMEIER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-01-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060127

2005-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-07-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-04-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OLSBERG HERMANN EVERKEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOSEF *STELTEMEIER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OLSBERG HERMANN EVERKEN GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-01-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OLSBERG HERMANN EVERKEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-07-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-07-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209727

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-04-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

LT LV RO SI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20010808;LV PAYMENT 20010808;RO PAYMENT 20010808;SI PAYMENT 20010808

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI