Global Patent Index - EP 1074205 A2

EP 1074205 A2 2001-02-07 - Clothes hanger for garments having a shaped shoulder

Title (en)

Clothes hanger for garments having a shaped shoulder

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel für Kleider mit einer geformten Schulter

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements avec une épaule modelée

Publication

EP 1074205 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113873 A

Priority

IT VI990172 A

Abstract (en)

The clothes hanger for garments having a shaped shoulder has the two ends (2) constituted by two surfaces which are essentially planar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/20; A47G 25/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2006.01); A47G 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2013.01); A47G 25/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074205 A2 20010207; EP 1074205 A3 20040825; CA 2313070 A1 20010204; IT VI990172 A1 20010205

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050226

2005-06-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/20 A

2004-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/30 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI