Global Patent Index - EP 1074282 A2

EP 1074282 A2 2001-02-07 - Bowling pinsetter

Title (en)

Bowling pinsetter

Title (de)

Kegelaufsetzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour disposer des quilles

Publication

EP 1074282 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116184 A

Priority

DE 19936274 A

Abstract (en)

The setting-up device has a rope-free automatic set-up machine. This is positioned above the skittles stand (1) and moves up and down. Each skittle has a separate set-up unit (10), which is operated independently of all other set-up units. All units are mounted on a plate-shaped holder with openings corresponding to the pattern of skittles on the stand. This generates a lifting movement of a moveable part of the set-up units. The moveable part is a basket with an internal holder for the skittles.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kegelaufsetzvorrichtung bei einem seillosen Kegelaufstellautomaten ist durch einzelne Kegelsetzeinheiten (10) ausgebildet, die unabhängig voneinander zum Absetzen eines Kegels betätigbar sind. Insbesondere wird eine solche Kegelsetzeinheit (10) über ein Gegengewicht so ausgebildet, daß kein motorischer Antrieb erforderlich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074282 A2 20010207; EP 1074282 A3 20030122; DE 19936274 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLLMER SPORT GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63D 5/08 A, 7A 63D 5/09 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI