Global Patent Index - EP 1074286 A2

EP 1074286 A2 2001-02-07 - Two-part device for making a toy wheel with cylindrical toy buiding blocks made of solid foam

Title (en)

Two-part device for making a toy wheel with cylindrical toy buiding blocks made of solid foam

Title (de)

Zweiteilige Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Spielzeugrades aus zylinderförmigen Spielbausteinen, die aus einem festen Schaum bestehen

Title (fr)

Dispositif en deux parties pour la fabrication d'une roue de jouet à partir de blocs de jeu de construction cylindriques en mousse solide

Publication

EP 1074286 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114103 A

Priority

DE 29913238 U

Abstract (en)

The two-part device has a cutter part (10) with channel (14) to hold a toy brick, and a slot-shaped guide (16) for a cutter tool, e.g. a knife, extend at an angle to the channel. The device also has a jointing part with circular ring-shaped channel to hold brick segments, and a wheel axle hole, coaxial to the channel, for insertion of wheel axles.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine zweiteilige Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Spielzeugrades aus zylinderförmigen Spielbausteinen, die aus einem festen Schaum bestehen. Die zweiteilige Vorrichtung umfasst eine Schneidvorrichtung, die eine Rinne zum Einlegen eines Spielbausteins und eine in einem Winkel zur Rinne verlaufende Führung für ein Trennwerkzeug aufweist, und eine Fügevorrichtung, die eine kreisringförmige Rinne (32) zum Einlegen von mit der Schneidvorrichtung von Spielbausteinen abgetrennten Spielbausteinsegmenten (38) sowie ein zur Rinne (32) koaxiales Radwellenloch zum Durchstecken einer Radwelle aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/26 (2006.01); A63H 17/267 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/262 (2013.01); Y10S 269/902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49481 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1066 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1079 (2013.01); Y10T 156/13 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1749 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913238 U1 19991111; EP 1074286 A2 20010207; EP 1074286 A3 20030312; US 6488067 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060321

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63H 33/00 A

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI