Global Patent Index - EP 1074317 A2

EP 1074317 A2 2001-02-07 - Method for flexibly rolling a metal strip

Title (en)

Method for flexibly rolling a metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum flexiblen Walzen eines Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le laminage flexible d'une bande métallique

Publication

EP 1074317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115953 A

Priority

  • DE 19936522 A
  • DE 19939166 A

Abstract (en)

Flexible metal strip rolling, involving work roll bending line control during or immediately after each roll gap adjustment to obtain flat strip, is new. A flexible rolling process for metal strip comprises adjusting the roll gap during rolling to achieve different strip thicknesses along the strip length, the bending lines of the work rolls being controlled in dependence on the adjusted roll gap during or immediately after each roll gap adjustment in order to achieve strip flatness.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben und dargestellt ist ein Verfahren zum flexiblen Walzen eines Metallbandes, wobei das Metallband während des Walzprozesses durch einen zwischen zwei Arbeitswalzen gebildeten Walzspalt geführt und der Walzspalt während des Walzvorgangs gezielt verfahren wird, um über die Länge des Metallbandes unterschiedliche Banddicken zu erzielen. Erfindungsgemäß ist ein Verfahren der zuvor beschriebenen Art zur Verfügung gestellt, bei dem eine gute Planheit des Metallbandes erzielt werden kann, und zwar auch relativ breiten Bändern, und zwar dadurch, daß während jedes Einstellens des Walzspalts oder unmittelbar danach die Biegelinien der Arbeitswalzen in Abhängigkeit vom eingestellten Walzspalt zur Erzielung einer Planheit des Metallbandes gesteuert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/26; B21B 37/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 21/30 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/26 (2006.01); B21B 37/38 (2006.01); B21B 38/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/38 (2013.01); B21B 37/26 (2013.01); B21B 38/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074317 A2 20010207; EP 1074317 A3 20030129; EP 1074317 B1 20050216; AT 289229 T 20050315; JP 2001079607 A 20010327; US 6336349 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009532 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAUGER, ANDREAS, DR.-ING.

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOPP, RAINER, PROF. DR.-ING.

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI