Global Patent Index - EP 1074345 A2

EP 1074345 A2 2001-02-07 - Rotary abrasive cutting disc

Title (en)

Rotary abrasive cutting disc

Title (de)

Rotierende Schneidschleifteller

Title (fr)

Disque de coupage abrasif rotatif

Publication

EP 1074345 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306275 A

Priority

GB 9918357 A

Abstract (en)

A method of making a rotary cutting disc comprises forming a metal support member (1), shaping at least one compacted body (4) of powdered material containing abrasive particles so as to enclose at least a portion of the periphery of the support member, and heating the body or bodies to sinter the powdered material and bond the or each body to the periphery of the support member, and then locally applying heat to at least a portion of the external junction between the or each body and the support member to form a weld (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 5/12; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/12 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/0009 (2013.01); B24D 5/12 (2013.01); B28D 1/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074345 A2 20010207; EP 1074345 A3 20021016; GB 2353045 A 20010214; GB 9918357 D0 19991006

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI