Global patent index - EP 1074346 A2

EP 1074346 A2 2001-02-07 - Toothed abrasive wheel

Title (en)

Toothed abrasive wheel

Title (de)

Gezahnte Schleifscheibe

Title (fr)

Meule abrasive dentée

Publication

EP 1074346 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00116146 A

Priority

IT MO990039 U

Abstract (en)

A toothed abrasive wheel (4) is designed for increasing the degree of aggressiveness on the surface to be worked and the degree of cooling and chip evacuation, and has an annular active band (TP) with patterns of teeth (5) arranged in series along broken or continuous spiral arcs which are concave in an inward direction in the two possible directions of rotation, with a tangential component; each series of teeth (5) having an irregular rhomboidal base is flanked by a pair of channels (6) which separates it from the contiguous series; air and chip evacuation occurs along the channels (6); the wheel is used in industrial coarse grinding and lapping of surfaces, particularly as a manual tool driven by an electric motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 7/06; B24D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 7/10 (2013.01); B24D 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074346 A2 20010207; EP 1074346 A3 20020410; IT 248518 Y1 20030204; IT MO990039 U1 20010206; IT MO990039 V0 19990806

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI