Global Patent Index - EP 1074358 A1

EP 1074358 A1 2001-02-07 - Working unit for edging wooden panels

Title (en)

Working unit for edging wooden panels

Title (de)

Bearbeitungseinheit für eine Vorrichtung zur Bildung von Rändern an Holzpaneele

Title (fr)

Unité d'usinage pour une machine a former les bords sur des panneaux en bois

Publication

EP 1074358 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830506 A

Priority

IT RN990026 U

Abstract (en)

An operative set for the milling of wooden panels comprises two shafts (3a,3b) actuated by motors (7) with related tools (4a,4b), elements (5) able to move relative to the machine bed (6) by means of actuators (8) to support the two shafts in parallel, wherein the moving element (5) is the same for the two shafts (3a,3b) and is articulated to the bed (6) with a pivot (11) parallel to the shafts, so that an alternating contact of the two tools (4a,4b) on the edge (2b) of the panels can occur. A single electric motor (7) can be provided for the two shafts actuated by means of a belt (10), and an articulated quadrilateral (13) can replace the pivot (11). Tracing elements (14a,14b) can be associated to the tools (4a,4b) to trace the edge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 19/10; B27F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/02 (2006.01); B27G 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/02 (2013.01); B27G 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074358 A1 20010207; IT 248727 Y1 20030212; IT RN990026 U1 20010129

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040817

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI