Global Patent Index - EP 1074360 A2

EP 1074360 A2 2001-02-07 - Multiaxial pressure casting device with swiveling axis

Title (en)

Multiaxial pressure casting device with swiveling axis

Title (de)

Mehrachsige Druckgussmaschine mit Schwenkachse

Title (fr)

Installation de coulage sous pression multiaxiale avec axe de pivotement

Publication

EP 1074360 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116160 A

Priority

DE 19935595 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (1) has at least one holder unit (15) to releasably hold at least one multicomponent casting mould (5). At least one press unit secures the casting moul. A removal point provides access to remove cast products (4). An exchange point provides axis to exchange the casting mould at one side other than that of the removal point. Preferably, the exchange point is on the opposite side to that of the removal point. Independent claims are included for a method to exchange casting moulds or individual parts of the machine and for a unit comprising several machines.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Druckgußmaschine (1) zum Herstellen von Gußstücken (4), insbesondere keramischen Grünlingen, mit zumindest einer Halteeinrichtung (15) zum lösbaren Halten zumindest einer mehrteiligen Gießform (5), zumindest einer Preßeinrichtung (15) zum Einspannen der in der zumindest einen Halteeinrichtung (15) gehaltenen Gießform (5) und einem Entnahmezugang zum Entnehmen von Gußstücken (4) an der Vorderseite der Druckgußmaschine (1). Der Entnahmezugang dient auch als Austauschzugang zum Austauschen der Gießformen (5). Zur Vermeidung des erforderlichen Abbaus von Entnahmeeinrichtungen (2) wird vorgeschlagen, einen separaten Austauschzugang (15, 21) zum Austauschen der Gießform (5) an einer Seite außer der Entnahmeseite, insbesondere an der Rückseite der Druckgußmaschine (1) bereitzustellen. Dadurch können Stillstandzeiten beim Austausch der Gießformen (4) deutlich verkürzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/24; B28B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/26 (2006.01); B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 17/009 (2013.01); B28B 1/266 (2013.01); B28B 7/0044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074360 A2 20010207; EP 1074360 A3 20030115; EP 1074360 B1 20040526; DE 19935595 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006564

2016-06-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006564

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006564

- Representative's name: THIELE, THOMAS, DIPL.-GEOPHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2015-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006564

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006564 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 1/24 A, 7B 28B 1/26 B, 7B 28B 17/00 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI