Global Patent Index - EP 1074387 A2

EP 1074387 A2 2001-02-07 - Printer for ink-jet printing apparatus

Title (en)

Printer for ink-jet printing apparatus

Title (de)

Druckvorrichtung für eine Tintenstrahldruckeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Imprimante pour appareil d'impression par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1074387 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114707 A

Priority

  • DE 19935896 A
  • DE 19959008 A

Abstract (en)

Printing devices of ink-jet printer is fabricated with a plane surface plate (16,17) having virtually zero thermal expansion and made from an electrically non-conductive material or from a semiconductor, with its transversely extending jet orifices (18,19) exactly reproducible with regard to size and shape to provide exact discrete jets (12) or droplets (13) of ink.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Druckvorrichtung (10) für eine Tintenstrahldruckeinrichtung, insbesondere für eine solche, die nach dem continuous-inkjet-Verfahren arbeitet, bei der elektrisch leitfähige Tinte (11) unter Druck als Strahl (12) und/oder unter Tropfenbildung (13) durch eine Vielzahl einzelner Düsenöffnungen (14) hindurch und an einzelnen Ladeelektroden (15) mit vom Potential der Tinte abweichendem anderen Potential vorbeigeführt wird. Diese Druckvorrichtung (10) ist gekennzeichnet durch zumindest eine im wesentlichen ebenflächige Platte (16,17) aus elektrisch nichtleitfähigem Material oder aus einem Halbleiter, z.B. aus Silizium, mit einer Vielzahl einzelnen quer hindurchführender Durchlässe (18,19) für jeweils einzelne Tintenstrahlen (12) bzw. Tintentropfen (13). Eine Platte (16) kann als Düsenplatte vorgesehen sein, an der unterseitig eine zweite als Ladeplatte (17) vorgesehene Platte befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/135 (2006.01); B41J 2/035 (2006.01); B41J 2/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/035 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0709198 A2 19960501 - SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074387 A2 20010207; EP 1074387 A3 20030115; CA 2314703 A1 20010130; CN 1282664 A 20010207; IL 137354 D0 20010724; JP 2001063069 A 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI