Global patent index - EP 1074393 A1

EP 1074393 A1 2001-02-07 - Jam-clearing device for a feeder of a franking machine

Title (en)

Jam-clearing device for a feeder of a franking machine

Title (de)

Papierstaubeseitigungsvorrichtung für einen Zuführer einer Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de débourrage pour alimenteur de machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 1074393 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402209 A

Priority

FR 9910066 A

Abstract (en)

Rollers (10,12,14) guide postal material through a franker (16) using a mobile table and cradle (22,24). If a blockage occurs a longitudinal member is initially displaced in the direction of transport and the lower rollers (12,14) are depressed through the action of a cam (262) and abutting toothed levers (26,28). If additional access is required the longitudinal member is moved further in the same direction to nearly withdraw all the lower rollers

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour le débourrage d'articles de courrier retenus dans le chemin de transport d'une machine de traitement de courrier, le transport des articles de courrier étant assuré par plusieurs séries de rouleaux d'entraînement réparties tout au long de ce chemin de transport et dont au moins deux séries de rouleaux (12, 14) sont disposées, par rapport au sens d'avancée des articles de courrier, respectivement en amont et en aval de moyens d'impression de l'empreinte postale (16). Ce dispositif comporte des moyens de commande manuelle pour, dans une première position, libérer en partie le chemin de transport des articles de courrier en abaissant simultanément les rouleaux d'entraînement amont et aval et pour, dans une seconde position, libérer en totalité le chemin de transport des articles de courrier en procédant à un retrait complet de l'ensemble des rouleaux d'entraînement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/12; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0724234 A2 19960731 - NEOPOST LTD [GB]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 223 (M - 411) 10 September 1985 (1985-09-10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074393 A1 20010207; EP 1074393 B1 20070725; DE 60035645 D1 20070906; DE 60035645 T2 20080410; FR 2797219 A1 20010209; FR 2797219 B1 20020329; US 6343786 B1 20020205

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080428

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20071004

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60035645

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-09-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041215

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI