Global Patent Index - EP 1074455 A1

EP 1074455 A1 2001-02-07 - Steering angle sensor apparatus for detecting the angular position of a steering wheel in a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Steering angle sensor apparatus for detecting the angular position of a steering wheel in a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Lenkwinkelsensoreinrichtung zum Erfassen der Winkelstellung des Lenkrades eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Appareil de capteur de l'angle de braquage de détection de position angulaire d'un volant de direction de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1074455 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112862 A

Priority

  • EP 99112862 A
  • DE 19810158 A

Abstract (en)

Magnets (7,8) are coupled to the rotational movement of the steering wheel. A magnetostrictive transducer (4) has a long wire (9) which extends over certain arc of a circle. The wire is magnetostrictively responsive and has an oscillation sensor (10) at one end. The magnetic field of the magnet is applied to different locations on the wire depending on the position of the steering wheel.

Abstract (de)

Eine Lenkwinkelsensoreinrichtung 1 zum Erfassen der Winkelstellung des Lenkrades eines Kraftfahrzeuges verwendet als Geber zumindest einen an die Drehbewegung des Lenkrades gekoppelten Gebermagneten 7, 8 und als Aufnahmemittel ein magnetostriktives Wandlerelement (Magnetostriktionswandler) 4. Dem Magnetostriktionswandler 4 ist eine langgestreckte, sich über einen bestimmten Kreisbogenbereich erstreckende, magnetostriktiv reagierende Wandlerleitung 9 zugeordnet, an deren einem Ende ein Schwingungssensor 10 zum Erfassen von magnetostriktiv erzeugten Spannungsimpulsen angeordnet ist. Die Wandlerleitung 9 ist ortsfest bezüglich der Drehbewegung des zumindest einen Gebermagneten 7, 8, so daß beim Drehen des Lenkrades das Magnetfeld eines Gebermagneten 7, 8 die Wandlerleitung 9 in Abhängigkeit von der Stellung des Lenkrades an unterschiedlichen Stellen beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 15/02; G01D 5/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4022837 A1 19920123 - MORCHE DIRK W DIPL ING [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19810158 A1 19990909; DE 59901353 D1 20020606; EP 1074455 A1 20010207; EP 1074455 B1 20020502; ES 2175879 T3 20021116

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175879

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901353

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-06

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BENDICKS, NORBERT, DIPL.-ING.

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOEBEL, RALF, DIPL.-ING.

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BLAESING, FRANK, DIPL.-ING

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NYCE, DAVID

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 62D 15/02 A

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991228

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI