Global Patent Index - EP 1074463 A2

EP 1074463 A2 2001-02-07 - Controllable pitch propeller for motor boats

Title (en)

Controllable pitch propeller for motor boats

Title (de)

Verstellpropeller für Motor-und Sportboote

Title (fr)

Hélice à pas variable pour bateaux de loisirs à moteur

Publication

EP 1074463 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114490 A

Priority

DE 19936948 A

Abstract (en)

The adjustable propeller for a marine outboard motor has a hub with sealed adjustment plates in openings at the peripheral sides. They are operated to be positioned around radial axes with blades, where each blade foot (26) grips into the opening with a dia. which is smaller that the dia. of the opening (14). The holding ring (16,17) is sealed on one side against the wall of the opening (14) and on the other side against the setting unit (20).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Verstellpropeller für Motor- und Sportboote mit einer Nabe (1), daran in umfangsseitigen Ausnehmungen abgedichtet angeordneten Verstelltellern (20), die mittels einer Verstelleinrichtung um radiale Achsen verstellbar sind, und mit Flügeln (2), die mit einem in die zugeordnete Ausnehmung (14) eingreifenden Flügelfuß (26) am zugeordneten Verstellteller (20) lösbar befestigt sind, wobei jeder Verstellteller (20) mit einem in die Ausnehmung eindrehbaren, den Verstellteller (20) randseitig überfassenden Haltering (16) spielfrei, jedoch drehbar am Boden seiner Ausnehmung gehalten ist. Um das Auswechseln der Flügel (2) des Verstellpropellers zu vereinfachen, soll der Durchmesser des Flügelfußes (26) kleiner sein als der Durchmesser der Ausnehmung (14) und soll der Haltering (16) einerseits gegen die Wandung der Ausnehmung (14) und andererseits gegen den Verstellteller (20) abgedichtet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/26 (2006.01); B63H 3/04 (2006.01); F02B 61/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 3/04 (2013.01); B63H 1/26 (2013.01); F02B 61/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0589338 A1 19940330 - LANDOLT ALEXANDER DR [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936948 C1 20010125; EP 1074463 A2 20010207; EP 1074463 A3 20021218; US 6352410 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASYC HOLDING S.A.

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, PETER

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI