Global Patent Index - EP 1074464 A3

EP 1074464 A3 2002-12-18 - Boat propulsion with a controllable pitch propeller

Title (en)

Boat propulsion with a controllable pitch propeller

Title (de)

Bootsantrieb mit einem Verstellpropeller

Title (fr)

Propulsion de bateau avec hélice à pas variable

Publication

EP 1074464 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00114491 A

Priority

DE 19936949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1074464A2] The boat outboard propeller drive system, with an adjustable propeller, has a hub on the hollow propeller shaft linked to the drive. The adjustment rod is operated by a double-lifting cylinder (16,17) with a hollow piston (16) open towards the setting rod (13) with the axial bearing (15). The setting rod (13) has a radial flange (14), supported on both sides by axial bearings (15) with a simple action. The setting rod (13) passes through a hollow piston rod (20) at the hollow piston (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/20 (2006.01); B63H 3/08 (2006.01); F16C 3/00 (2006.01); F16J 1/12 (2006.01); F02B 61/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 3/082 (2013.01); B63H 2003/085 (2013.01); F02B 61/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936949 C1 20010125; EP 1074464 A2 20010207; EP 1074464 A3 20021218; EP 1074464 B1 20040303; JP 2001080578 A 20010327; US 6250979 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005485

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005485

- Representative's name: DR. NIEMANN & WETTLAUFER, DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005485 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASYC HOLDING S.A.

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, PETER

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI