Global patent index - EP 1074465 A2

EP 1074465 A2 2001-02-07 - Manual control lever for motor boats

Title (en)

Manual control lever for motor boats

Title (de)

Handhebelsteuerung für Motor-und Sportboote

Title (fr)

Levier de contrôle manuel pour bateaux de loisirs à moteur

Publication

EP 1074465 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114489 A

Priority

DE 19936946 A

Abstract (en)

The hand lever control has a manually operated lever (5) which is pivoted in 2 function planes, one of which has a zero position for the lever, in which the engine is operated at idling revs, with the clutch closed and the propeller blades set at a neutral angle, the movement of the lever from the zero position causing an increase in the engine revs and adjustment of the propeller blade angle in opposite directions, dependent on the lever pivot direction. The second function plane has a rest position for the lever into which it is moved from the zero position and in which the clutch is disengaged and from which the lever can be pivoted for increasing the engine revs

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Handhebelsteuerung für Motor- und Sportboote mit einem Motor, einer Verstellpropelleranlage und einer dazwischen geschalteten Kupplung. Damit der Bootsführer mit nur einem Handhebel die Motordrehzahl, die Flügelsteigung und die Kupplung kontrollieren bzw. verstellen kann, ist der Handhebel in zwei Funktionsebenen verschwenkbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/22; B63H 3/00; B63H 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 20/02 (2006.01); B63H 3/10 (2006.01); B63H 21/22 (2006.01); G05G 9/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/213 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936946 C1 20010125; EP 1074465 A2 20010207; EP 1074465 A3 20020911; JP 2001080579 A 20010327; US 6264512 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASYC HOLDING S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MUELLER, PETER

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI