Global Patent Index - EP 1074496 A1

EP 1074496 A1 2001-02-07 - Device for gathering printed matter

Title (en)

Device for gathering printed matter

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammentragen von Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour assembler des imprimés

Publication

EP 1074496 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810668 A

Priority

EP 99810668 A

Abstract (en)

The device for collecting together printed products (2) comprises an endless conveyer (24) with a saddle-shaped top region (30). Printed products with a fold (32) fit over this and are conveyed along between holders (29) to a later processing area. This contains a guide (1) which slides along the fold and holds it.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung weist einen endlos umlaufendes Förderorgan (24) auf, das einen sattelförmigen Bereich (30) besitzt, auf dem die mit einem Falz (32) versehenen Druckprodukte (2) rittlings mittels am Förderorgan (24) angebrachten Mitnehmern (29) gefördert werden. In wenigstens einem Weiterbearbeitungsbereich (A), werden die rittlings auf dem Förderorgan (24) geförderten Druckprodukte (2) bearbeitet. In einem Weiterbearbeitungsbereich (A) ist ein Führungsmittel (1) angeordnet, das die Druckprodukte (2) im sattelförmigen Bereich (30) entlang ihres Falzes (32) gleitverschieblich führt und hält. Vorzugsweise weist das Führungsmittel (1) eine Führungsschiene (12) auf, welche über dem sattelförmigen Bereich (30) angeordnet ist und sich in Förderrichtung (38) erstreckt. Die Erfindung ermöglicht eine präzise Weiterverarbeitung von Druckprodukten auf einer Sammelstrecke, insbesondere die Herstellung eines Griffregisters auf einem Sammelhefter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/32; B65H 29/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/32 (2006.01); B65H 29/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 9/04 (2013.01); B65H 5/32 (2013.01); B65H 29/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074496 A1 20010207; EP 1074496 B1 20070328; DE 59914279 D1 20070510

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914279

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI