Global Patent Index - EP 1074498 A2

EP 1074498 A2 2001-02-07 - Auxiliary threading device for threading the initial part of a material web into a roller machine

Title (en)

Auxiliary threading device for threading the initial part of a material web into a roller machine

Title (de)

Einführhilfsvorrichtung zum Einführen des Anfangs einer Materialbahn in eine Walzenmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif auxilier pour guider le début d'une bande de matériau dans une machine à rouleaux

Publication

EP 1074498 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115296 A

Priority

DE 19937196 A

Abstract (en)

The guide for feeding the start of a web (8) into the nip of a machine with rollers has a gripping head (10) and a carrier (14). These are mounted on a pivot (13) and can be moved to present a channelling device (15) to the rollers, so that the web is fed directly into the nip, or so that rollers (24, 25) feed the web in contact with one of the rollers (6) of the machine before it enters the nip.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Einführhilfsvorrichtung (1) angegeben zum Einführen des Anfangs einer Materialbahn (8) in eine Walzenmaschine (4). Hierbei möchte man das Einfädeln der Materialbahn erleichtern. Dazu ist die Einführhilfseinrichtung ausgerüstet mit einem Greifkopf (10) und einem Träger (14), wobei der Greifkopf (10) am Träger (14) um eine Schwenkachse (13) zwischen einer Einlauf- und einer Auslaufstellung verschwenkbar angeordnet ist und einen Einlaufabschnitt (11) und einen Auslaufabschnitt (12) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0063 (2013.01); B65H 2301/522 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074498 A2 20010207; EP 1074498 A3 20020327; DE 19937196 A1 20010301; US 6325265 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041026

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 19/28 A, 7B 65H 20/00 B, 7D 21G 9/00 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI