Global patent index - EP 1074499 A2

EP 1074499 A2 2001-02-07 - Sheet delivery apparatus

Title (en)

Sheet delivery apparatus

Title (de)

Bogenausleger

Title (fr)

Appareil de sortie de feuilles

Publication

EP 1074499 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114111 A

Priority

DE 29913487 U

Abstract (en)

The suction unit includes a number of motor driven axial fans (30) located next to the sheet fall region (34) with its suction side facing the sheet fall region. A number of the fans are located close to a side of the sheet fall region which lies upstream in relation to the processing direction. This number can vary depending on the processed sheets (3) with regard to their position. An Independent claim is included for a printing machine incorporating the proposed sheet deliverer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Ausleger einer Bogen ausgebenden Maschine, insbesondere einer Druckmaschine, welche von den Bogen betriebsmäßig in einer Verarbeitungsrichtung mit einer Verarbeitungsgeschwindigkeit durchlaufen wird, mit einer Bogenbremse (11), welche einen jeweiligen der verarbeiteten Bogen (3) übernimmt, auf eine Ablagegeschwindigkeit verzögert und zur Bildung eines Stapels (14) in einen Bogenfallbereich (34) entläßt, und mit einer Absaugvorrichtung mit einer betriebsmäßig in den Bogenfallbereich (34) eingreifenden Sogwirkung. Um einer gegenseitigen Behinderung der Bogen (3) im Bogenfallbereich (34) mit möglichst geringem Energieaufwand entgegenzuwirken, ist die Absaugvorrichtung mittels benachbart zum Bogenfallbereich (34) angeordneter, motorisch angetriebener Strömungsmaschinen (30) gebildet, deren Saugseiten dem Bogenfallbereich (34) zugewandt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/28 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/686 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913487 U1 19990923; EP 1074499 A2 20010207; EP 1074499 A3 20020130; JP 2001072299 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI