Global Patent Index - EP 1074503 A2

EP 1074503 A2 2001-02-07 - Levelling for double deck elevator car

Title (en)

Levelling for double deck elevator car

Title (de)

Höhenausgleich für Doppeldeckaufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Mise à niveau pour ascenseur à double cabine

Publication

EP 1074503 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111810 A

Priority

JP 15941399 A

Abstract (en)

The double deck elevator car possesses a first elevator car (23a) and a second elevator car (23b) positioned in the vertical direction inside an outer frame (11). The car frame (11) is raised and lowered via suspension cables (16). Transmission members (19) possessing first screw shafts (19a), which engage with a car frame (22a) that supports the first elevator car (23a), and second screw shafts (19b), which engage with a car frame (22b) that supports the second elevator car (23b), are provided on the outer frame (11) so that they are free to rotate. The first screw shafts (19a) and the second screw shafts (19b) are formed with threads that are mutually opposite, and are driven by drive motors (17). The gap between the two elevator cars (23a) and (23b) is adjusted by rotating the transmission members (19). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/42; B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/00 (2006.01); B66B 1/42 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074503 A2 20010207; EP 1074503 A3 20040407; EP 1074503 B1 20080723; CN 1176003 C 20041117; CN 1276336 A 20001213; DE 60039555 D1 20080904; JP 2000344448 A 20001212; KR 100394503 B1 20030814; KR 20010007244 A 20010126; TW 555685 B 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090424

2008-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60039555 P 20080904

2008-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2008-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66B 1/42 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66B 11/02 B

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI