Global patent index - EP 1074507 A1

EP 1074507 A1 2001-02-07 - Support structure for long escalators or moving walkways

Title (en)

Support structure for long escalators or moving walkways

Title (de)

Tragkonstruktion für lange Fahrtreppen und Fahrsteige

Title (fr)

Structure porteuse pour de longs escaliers ou trottoirs roulants

Publication

EP 1074507 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116497 A

Priority

  • EP 00116497 A
  • EP 99810702 A

Abstract (en)

The support structure for long escalators, and moving walkways, has at least one additional wall carrier (5) fitted to the base wall carrier (4), mounted at the sides. Both wall carriers (4,5) are in a lattice structure using open roller profiles or rectangular hollow profiles. They can also be of solid plates. The wall carriers (4,5) are bonded together at their sides by screw bolts, rivets or welding.

Abstract (de)

Die Stabilität von Tragkonstruktionen für Fahrtreppen und Fahrsteige wird im Falle einer Anwendung mit grossen Stützweiten dadurch erhöht, dass an die Basis-Wandträger (4) der Tragkonstruktion je mindestens ein Zusatz-Wandträger (5) seitlich angeflanscht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4674619 A 19870623 - NAKAZAWA HAYASHI [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074507 A1 20010207; EP 1074507 B1 20041215

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI