Global Patent Index - EP 1074533 A1

EP 1074533 A1 2001-02-07 - Gas generating agent

Title (en)

Gas generating agent

Title (de)

Gaserzeugungsmittel

Title (fr)

Agent générateur de gaz

Publication

EP 1074533 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306685 A

Priority

JP 22415599 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a gas generating agent containing ammonium nitrate, the gas generating agent comprising compounding at least one type selected from the group consisting of a simple substance of elements producing a nitrate having a heat decomposition temperature higher than the heat decomposition temperature of ammonium nitrate, an alloy of the element and a compound of the element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06; C06B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/26 (2011.01); B60R 21/264 (2006.01); C06B 23/00 (2006.01); C06B 33/04 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 23/006 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074533 A1 20010207; JP 2001048690 A 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041113

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI