Global Patent Index - EP 1074605 A1

EP 1074605 A1 2001-02-07 - Process and apparatus for producing a cooking oil from rapeseed

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for producing a cooking oil from rapeseed

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Speiseöl aus Rapssaat

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de production d'huile de cuisson à partir de colza

Publication

EP 1074605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112339 A

Priority

DE 19937081 A

Abstract (en)

Production of food oil from rapeseed and/or other oil seeds comprises sieving, heating, dehusking and cold pressing. Production of food oil from rapeseed and/or other oil seeds comprises sieving to give three fractions of different grain size comprising trimmings, cleaned rapeseed and waste grain, transporting the trimmings and waste grain to a silo, heating the cleaned rapeseed at below 40 degrees C to give a water content of 4.5-5.5% and grinding it to give three further fractions, adding the unusable fractions to the silo, and dehusking the usable grain and cold pressing it and removing solids. Independent claims are included for the apparatus used comprising a sieve, a drier, a rolling mill, a further sieve, a separator, a conditioner, a flocking rolling mill and a press.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Speiseöl aus Rapssaat oder anderen Ölsaaten wird die Rapssaat (A.A) durch Klassieren in drei Fraktionen verschiedener Partikelgrößen getrennt, und zwar in Besatz (A.D), in gereinigte Rapssaat (A.E) und in Kümmerkorn (A.F), wird die gereinigte und klassierte Rapssaat (A.E) anschließend getrocknet, wird danach die getrocknete Rapssaat (A.G) gebrochen, wird dann die gebrochene Rapssaat in drei Fraktionen verschiedener Partikelgröße getrennt, und zwar in Anbruch (A.J), in Nutzbruch (A.M) und in Feinbruch (A.N), wird der Nutzbruch (A.M) in Schälraps (A.O) und Schalen (A.P) zerlegt, wird sodann der Schälraps (A.O) befeuchtet und anschließend flockiert, wird danach der flockierte Schälraps (P.C) in einer Presse (10) kalt verpreßt, und wird schließlich durch Reinigung des aus der Presse (10) austretenden Preßöls (P.D) von Trubstoffen (Feststoffen) Speiseöl (P.F) gebildet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 1/02; B02B 3/04; B02C 9/04; C11B 1/04; C11B 1/06; C11B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02B 3/04 (2006.01); B02C 9/04 (2006.01); C11B 1/02 (2006.01); C11B 1/04 (2006.01); C11B 1/06 (2006.01); C11B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 9/04 (2013.01); B02B 3/045 (2013.01); C11B 1/02 (2013.01); C11B 1/04 (2013.01); C11B 1/06 (2013.01); C11B 1/102 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074605 A1 20010207; EP 1074605 B1 20030827; AT 248213 T 20030915; DE 19937081 A1 20010215; DE 19937081 C2 20020502; DK 1074605 T3 20031201; PL 201206 B1 20090331; PL 341836 A1 20010212

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TEUTOBURGER OELMUEHLE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHNEIDER, FELIX HORST, PROF. DR.-ING., 45239 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50003425

2016-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003425

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003425 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010310

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI