Global Patent Index - EP 1074656 A3

EP 1074656 A3 2001-05-09 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1074656 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107659 A

Priority

DE 19936330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1074656A2] The flow in a head box is divided into layers by separators (3.1 to 3.3), each layer carrying tubular inserts (18) with swirl generators (20) that superimpose a secondary vortex flow over the primary forward flow. Each flow channel has a first convergent section and a second, more strongly, convergent section. All the second convergent sections have an identical cross-sectional profile along their length. The swirl generators can be spiral inserts or fins, acoustic or electro-magnetic impulse generators, magnetically coupled rotors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074656 A2 20010207; EP 1074656 A3 20010509; DE 19936330 A1 20010208; US 6303004 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI