Global patent index - EP 1074662 A2

EP 1074662 A2 2001-02-07 - Marking system for multiple-track roadways

Title (en)

Marking system for multiple-track roadways

Title (de)

Markierungssystem für mehrspurige Verkehrswege

Title (fr)

Système de marquage pour routes à voies multiples

Publication

EP 1074662 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111183 A

Priority

DE 19936447 A

Abstract (en)

The road marking system defines the traffic lanes using adjustable lane markings (7), each of which is moved between a position in which it lies flush with the road surface (11) and a raised position, by displacement along its vertical axis via a setting drive (74,10). The road marking may have a housing (71) anchored in the road surface and an optical display unit (72) with passive retroreflective elements raised above the level of the road surface in the operative position.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Markierungssystem werden zum bedarfsabhängigen Festlegen von Fahrspuren eines mehrspurigen Verkehrsweges (1, 2) auf diesem ortsfest angeordnete, dabei verstellbare Spurmarkierungen (7) verwendet. Diese sind als in den Verkehrsweg eingelassene, mittels eines in ihrer vertikalen Längsachse wirksamen Stellantriebes (z. B. 74, 10) wahlweise höhenverstellbare Unterflurfeuer ausgebildet, um in einem inaktiven Ruhezustand mit ihrer Oberkante im wesentlichen mit der Fahrbahndecke (11) des Verkehrsweges abzuschließen bzw. im aktivierten Betriebszustand mit ihrer Oberkante über die Fahrbahndecke hinauszuragen. Sie besitzen ein in dieser zu verankerndes Gehäuse (71) sowie eine in letzterem längsbeweglich gelagerte optische Einheit (72). Die optische Einheit kann als eine passive, mit retroreflektierenden Flächen ausgestattete bzw. als eine aktive, mit einer ansteuerbaren Lichtquelle (76) ausgestattete Einheit ausgebildet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/594 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/594 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074662 A2 20010207; EP 1074662 A3 20030730

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI NL

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI