Global Patent Index - EP 1074669 A1

EP 1074669 A1 2001-02-07 - Self-carrying plate

Title (en)

Self-carrying plate

Title (de)

Selbsttragende Platte

Title (fr)

Panneau autoportant

Publication

EP 1074669 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500135 A

Priority

EP 99500135 A

Abstract (en)

The innovative SELF-CARRYING PLATE is composed of a sheet with a polygonal geometric shape composed of a central flat rolled area (1) equipped with layered ledges (2) framing the central area of the plate (1), connecting on each edge of the flat polygonal piece some grooves (3) with edging on ends (4) of finished comers (5) that are positioned on the same plane as the central laminate area (1). The grooves (3) are positioned consecutively or alternately, each section being constituted generically in the shape of a "U" or inverted "U". The grooves also have supports (6) composed of a prolongation of the groove (3), but considerably smaller, i.e., slightly lower at the point of union. When the SELF-CARRYING PLATE is triangular in shape, another means of connection is used composed of a hexagonal cover (7) equipped with several vertical decks (10) protruding radially on the bottom, each of which is associated with a union element (8) of a tubular configuration into which the groove assembly pieces are inserted. On the top of the hexagonal cover there is a slightly larger rubber sealing piece (9) which exerts pressure on the angle and seals the hexagonal joint. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/08; E04F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/18 (2013.01); E04C 2/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074669 A1 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI