Global Patent Index - EP 1074677 A2

EP 1074677 A2 2001-02-07 - Office at home

Title (en)

Office at home

Title (de)

Büro zu Hause

Title (fr)

Bureau de maison

Publication

EP 1074677 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113719 A

Priority

BR 9903437 A

Abstract (en)

This invention discloses a building structure including a first plurality of residential use configured subunits, and a second plurality of non-residential use configured subunits interspersed among the first plurality of residential use configured subunits, the first plurality of residential use configured subunits being accessible from outside the building structure via a first access pathway and the second plurality of residential use configured subunits being accessible from outside the building structure via a second access pathway, separate from the first access pathway. A method for constructing a building structure comprising the steps of configuring a first plurality of residential use subunits and configuring a second plurality of non-residential use subunits interspersed among the first plurality of residential use configured subunits is also disclosed <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0109444 A2 20010208; WO 0109444 A3 20010816; AU 6142400 A 20010219; BR 9903437 A 20010313; EP 1074677 A2 20010207; EP 1074677 A3 20020821

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-06-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04H 1/02 A, 7E 04H 1/04 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI