Global patent index - EP 1074683 A1

EP 1074683 A1 2001-02-07 - Locking device for windows and doors having at least three wings

Title (en)

Locking device for windows and doors having at least three wings

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für mindestens dreiflügelige Fenster und Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour fenêtres ou portes à au moins trois battants

Publication

EP 1074683 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108881 A

Priority

  • DE 19936018 A
  • DE 10011991 A

Abstract (en)

The locking system for a window or door, with at least three panels and without a center post, has an inner beating bar with a bolt (25) and a closure (32). The bolt (25) is at the panel frame flanked by window/door panels. The panel frame is gripped over by a flanking frame by the inner bar, at the swing axis, and the bolt (25) gives a locking action with the flanking frame which grips over it. When a flanking panel is opened, the bolt (25) is moved automatically out of the locked position, and the secured panel is released.

Abstract (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für mindestens dreiflügelige Fenster und Türen ohne Mittelpfosten mit innenliegender Schlagleiste (22, 23) bestehend aus einem Riegel (25) und einem Schließstück (32), wobei der Riegel (25) am Flügelrahmen (5) angebracht ist, der an zwei benachbarte Flügelrahmen (3, 4) angrenzt, wobei der Flügelrahmen (5) von einem der benachbarten Flügelrahmen (3 oder 4) an der Drehachse mittels der innenliegenden Schlagleiste (22, 23) übergriffen wird und der Riegel (25) mit einem der übergreifenden Flügelrahmen (3 oder 4) verriegelnd zusammenwirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 7/06; E05B 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 7/06 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 7/06 (2013.01); E05B 17/007 (2013.01); E05B 63/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074683 A1 20010207; DE 10011991 A1 20010913

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI