Global Patent Index - EP 1074688 A2

EP 1074688 A2 2001-02-07 - Pressure-sensitive device for blocking electrically actuated closing devices

Title (en)

Pressure-sensitive device for blocking electrically actuated closing devices

Title (de)

Druckempfindliche Vorrichtung zur Blockierung elektrisch angetriebener beweglicher Schliessvorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de capteur sensible à la pression pour blocage de dispositifs électriques de fermeture

Publication

EP 1074688 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116364 A

Priority

ES 9901803 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a flexible hollow profile (1) of rubber or similar with two parts (2) in its interior, likewise of rubber material but electrically conductive and containing embedded electric conductors (3). The entire arrangement is connected to an external electrical supply. A block (7) of rubber or of a thermoplastic material of low electrical conductivity is formed on one end of the profile, via which the electric circuit is connected with a high impedance for the electric current so that a very low current flows continuously through the circuit to enable the functionality of the device to be checked.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung besteht aus einem flexiblen hohlen Gummiprofil (1), in dessen Innerem in Längsrichtung zwei Teile oder Elemente (2) eingef1ormt sind, die ebenfalls aus Gummi bestehen, der jedoch leitfähig ist, in denen zwei Leiter (3) eingebettet und wahlweise Öffnungen (4) zum Einstecken und Anschluß der Pole (5) eines Steckverbinders (6) vorgesehen sind, um die elektrische Verbindung nach außen herzustellen. An dem Ende, das dem Steckverbinder (6) gegenüberliegt, trägt das Profil (1) einen an diesem Ende angeformten Gummiblock (7) mit geringer Leitfähigkeit und demzufolge hohem Widerstand, um jederzeit eine Prüfung der Funktionsfähigkeit zu ermöglichen. Das an der Führung eines automatisch betätigten Schließelements angebrachte Profil (1) stellt den Druck fest, der dadurch ausgeübt wird, daß sich zwischen dem beweglichen Schließelement und dem in dessen Aufnahme angebrachten Profil zufällig die Hand oder den Kopf einer Person befinden und sperrt die Funktion der beweglichen Schließvorrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/443 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/40 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074688 A2 20010207; EP 1074688 A3 20010404; SK 11252000 A3 20010312

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020620

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI