Global Patent Index - EP 1074693 A2

EP 1074693 A2 2001-02-07 - Reciprocating piston device

Title (en)

Reciprocating piston device

Title (de)

Hubkolbenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à piston alternatif

Publication

EP 1074693 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124143 A

Priority

DE 19936809 A

Abstract (en)

The reciprocating piston assembly has at least one piston (9) which moves to and fro within a cylinder (3), keyed against rotation, with a roller (1) rotating around the sliding axis of the piston (9). It has at least one closed rolling take-off cam (4) around its rotary axis, with a reciprocating movement on the axial line of the roller (1). At least one bearing (10,11) is fixed to the piston (9), aligned across the rotary axis of the roller (1), to roll with the cam (4) on the roller (1). The linear movement of the piston (9) is converted into a rotary movement by the roller (1).

Abstract (de)

Hubkolbenvorrichtung mit mindestens einem Kolben, der in einem Zylinder verdrehsicher geführt ist, einer um die Verschiebeachse des Kolbens drehbar gelagerten Walze, die mindestens eine um ihre Drehachse erstreckte, geschlossene Abrollkurve mit einem in Axialrichtung der Walze hin- und hergehenden Verlauf aufweist, mindestens einem fest mit dem Kolben verbundenen Lager, das quer zur Drehachse der Walze ausgerichtet ist und auf dem die Walze mit der Abrollkurve abrollbar ist, wodurch die Linearbewegung des Kolbens in einer Rotationsbewegung der Walze umwandelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 3/00 (2006.01); F01B 9/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01B 9/026 (2013.01); F01B 3/0005 (2013.01); F02B 75/246 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074693 A2 20010207; EP 1074693 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110701

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHMIDT, ELMER

2007-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, ELMER

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01B 3/00 A, 7F 04B 1/14 B, 7F 16H 25/12 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI