Global Patent Index - EP 1074701 A1

EP 1074701 A1 2001-02-07 - Breather device for a crankcase of a combustion engine

Title (en)

Breather device for a crankcase of a combustion engine

Title (de)

Entlüftungsvorrichtung für ein Kurbelgehäuse einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation d'un carter de moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1074701 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114083 A

Priority

DE 19937033 A

Abstract (en)

The ventilation (10) to extract gases from the crankcase (11) of an internal combustion motor has a gas escape channel (13) and an oil separator (14) integrated into it.. The ventilation gas is drawn by suction from the crankcase (11) through a ventilation channel (22) at the cylinder head (12). The ventilation channel (22) with the gas escape channel (13) give a connection with the crankcase (11) through the cylinder head (12) to an external control zone outside the cylinder head.

Abstract (de)

Die Entlüftungsvorrichtung (10) weist eine die Entlüftungsgase aus dem Kurbelgehäuse (11) absaugende Entlüftungsleitung (13) und einen Ölabscheider (14) auf. Der Ölabscheider (14) ist in der Entlüftungsleitung (13) angeordnet und in dieser integriert, so daß die Entlüftungsvorrichtung (10) durch einen einfachen und kompakten Aufbau gekennzeichnet ist. Die Entlüftungsgase werden vorteilhafterweise durch einen Entlüftungskanal (22) eines Zylinderkopfes (12) hindurch aus dem Kurbelgehäuse (11) abgesaugt, wobei der Entlüftungskanal (22) die Entlüftungsleitung (13) mit dem Kurbelgehäuse (11) durch den Zylinderkopf (12) hindurch und außerhalb des Zylinderkopf-Steuerraumes verbindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3918785 A1 19901213 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074701 A1 20010207; DE 19937033 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040708

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI