Global Patent Index - EP 1074703 A1

EP 1074703 A1 2001-02-07 - A method of producing a catalyst, especially prefabricating a catalyst housing or tube of modular construction and prefabricated tube produced thereby

Title (en)

A method of producing a catalyst, especially prefabricating a catalyst housing or tube of modular construction and prefabricated tube produced thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Katalysators, insbesondere Vorfertigung eines Katalysatormantels bzw. -rohrs in Modulbauweise sowie hiernach gefertigtes Rohr

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur, notamment préfabrication d'une enveloppe ou d'un tube d'un catalyseur à construction modulaire et un tube préfabriqué ainsi préparé

Publication

EP 1074703 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116381 A

Priority

  • DE 19936814 A
  • DE 19945350 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a catalyst for a motor exhaust system, especially the center section module, a solid block and a shrouding mantle are fitted into a prepared pipe which matches the shape and dimensions of the block with space for the shrouding mantle, to give a constant gap between it and the block. The pipe (1) has a cross section in the shape of a circle, oval or polygon which is prepared pref. with two identical shaped pipe sections (2,3). They are fitted around the block and, after setting the constant gap, they are welded together along their sides. The gap size is pref. 3.8 mm plus or minus 0.6 mm.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Katalysators, insbesondere eines Mittelstückes eines Kraftfahrzeug-Katalysators in Modulbauweise, durch Einbringen zumindest eines Monoliths und eines umgebenden Lagermantels in ein gefertigtes Rohr, welches im Querschnitt im wesentlichen das Monolithprofil plus Aufmaß für den Lagermantel aufweist, wobei eine Anpassung des Rohrgehäusemaßes auf einen konstanten Lagerspalt zum Monolith erfolgt, wird vorgeschlagen, ein im Querschnitt rundes, ovales oder polygones Rohr (1) aus zwei vorzugsweise identischen Rohrformteilen (2, 3) vorzufertigen, wobei die Rohrformteile (2, 3) nach Einbringen des Monoliths nebst Lagermantel zu einem geschlossenen runden, ovalen oder polygonen Rohr (1) zusammengesetzt und dann nach Einstellung des konstanten Lagerspalts beidseits längsverschweißt werden. Jedes Rohrformteil (2 bzw. 3) weist insbesondere einen abgesetzten Längsrand (4 bzw. 5) auf, welcher eine verschiebliche Aufnahme für den nicht abgesetzten Längsrand (6 bzw. 7) des anderen Rohrformteils bildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2857 (2013.01); F01N 2450/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01); F01N 2470/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4433974 C1 19960328 - EBERSPAECHER J [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074703 A1 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI