Global Patent Index - EP 1074719 A2

EP 1074719 A2 2001-02-07 - Method to control an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method to control an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1074719 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114484 A

Priority

DE 19937194 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves injecting fuel into a combustion chamber, especially. in two operating modes, whereby the effect of the operating method on the engine depends on a number of emergency running requirements. The emergency running requirements are co-ordinated and are checked for whether they can be transposed and for whether they are inconsistent. An Independent claim is also included for a control element, for an internal combustion engine and for a controller.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Brennkraftmaschine insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug beschrieben, die mit einem Brennraum versehen ist, in den Kraftstoff insbesondere in mindestens zwei Betriebsarten, einspritzbar ist. Es ist ein Steuergerät vorgesehen, mit dem in Abhängigkeit von einer Mehrzahl von Notlaufanforderungen auf die Bernnkraftmaschine einwirkbar ist. Die Mehrzahl von Notlaufanforderungen können durch das Steuergerät koordiniert werden (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/263 (2013.01); F02D 2041/227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074719 A2 20010207; EP 1074719 A3 20030502; EP 1074719 B1 20050309; DE 19937194 A1 20010222; JP 2001065394 A 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140706

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140706

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140706

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009708 P 20050414

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/22 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/30 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/26 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI