Global patent index - EP 1074733 A2

EP 1074733 A2 2001-02-07 - Control circuitry for an ignition coil

Title (en)

Control circuitry for an ignition coil

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung einer Zündspule

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande de bobine d'allumage

Publication

EP 1074733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109567 A

Priority

DE 19937055 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit has a first semiconducting switch (T1) with a load path connected in series with a primary coil (L1) of the ignition coil and a control electrode (G) for driving according to a first drive signal. A second semiconducting switch (T2) has a load path connected in parallel to the primary coil and a control electrode (G) for driving by a second control signal.

Abstract (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung einer Zündspule, die folgende Merkmale aufweist: einen ersten Halbleiterschalter (T1) mit einer Laststrecke (D-S), die in Reihe zu einer Primärwicklung (L1) der Zündspule geschaltet ist, und mit einer Steuerelektrode (G) für die Ansteuerung nach Maßgabe eines ersten Ansteuersignals (A1); einen zweiten Halbleiterschalter (T2) mit einer Laststrecke (D-S), die parallel zu der Primärwicklung (L1) geschaltet ist, und mit einer Steuerelektrode (G) für die Ansteuerung nach Maßgabe eines zweiten Ansteuersignals (A2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/0421 (2013.01); Y10T 307/773 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074733 A2 20010207; EP 1074733 A3 20020925; US 6310331 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02P 3/04 A, 7F 02P 3/05 B, 7F 02P 3/055 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI