Global Patent Index - EP 1074733 A3

EP 1074733 A3 2002-09-25 - Control circuitry for an ignition coil

Title (en)

Control circuitry for an ignition coil

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung einer Zündspule

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande de bobine d'allumage

Publication

EP 1074733 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00109567 A

Priority

DE 19937055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1074733A2] The circuit has a first semiconducting switch (T1) with a load path connected in series with a primary coil (L1) of the ignition coil and a control electrode (G) for driving according to a first drive signal. A second semiconducting switch (T2) has a load path connected in parallel to the primary coil and a control electrode (G) for driving by a second control signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/04; F02P 3/05; F02P 3/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/0421 (2013.01); Y10T 307/773 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074733 A2 20010207; EP 1074733 A3 20020925; US 6310331 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02P 3/04 A, 7F 02P 3/05 B, 7F 02P 3/055 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI