Global Patent Index - EP 1074734 A2

EP 1074734 A2 2001-02-07 - Axial piston pump

Title (en)

Axial piston pump

Title (de)

Axialkolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à pistons axiaux

Publication

EP 1074734 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112276 A

Priority

DE 19936662 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a drive plate (5) supported on an electric motor bearing ring (7) via roller bearings (6). A wobble plate (8) is supported on the drive plate via roller bearings (9). Pairs of spring-loaded pistons (10) are supported on the wobble plate. A cylinder part (11) is set in the pump housing (12) to clamp a valve plate between the housing and cylinder part. Connecting channels (14) in the valve plate for vacuum and pressure channels (15,16) with non-return valves (17,18).

Abstract (de)

Eine elektromotorgetriebene Axialkolbenpumpe (1) für Brennkraftmaschinen hat eine mittels Wälzlagern (6,9) gelagerte, ortsfeste Taumelscheibe (8). Zwischen Zylinderblock (11) und Gehäuse (12) ist eine Ventilplatte (13) eingespannt. Die Rückschlagventile (17,18) sind als Blattfederventile ausgebildet. Die Taumelscheibe (8) wird mittels Federwippe (25) an einem Zentrierzapfen (26) des Zylinderblocks (11) abgestützt. Der Elektromotor der Pumpe ist im Saugbereich der Pumpe zwischen Sauganschluss (21) und Saugkanälen (15) angeordnet. Die Saugkanäle führen über Blatteinlassventile (24,28) zu der Ventilplatte (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/16 (2006.01); F04B 1/02 (2006.01); F04B 1/14 (2006.01); F04B 1/18 (2006.01); F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 53/10 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/148 (2013.01); F04B 1/145 (2013.01); F04B 1/18 (2013.01); F04B 17/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074734 A2 20010207; EP 1074734 A3 20011107; EP 1074734 B1 20040901; DE 19936662 A1 20010215; JP 2001065447 A 20010316; JP 4473426 B2 20100602

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-09-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041212

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007597

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALBRO ENGINE MANAGEMENT LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TI AUTOMOTIVE (NEUSS) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 1/14 A, 7F 04B 1/18 B, 7F 04B 17/03 B

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI