Global Patent Index - EP 1074740 A1

EP 1074740 A1 2001-02-07 - Hydrostatic rotary piston machine

Title (en)

Hydrostatic rotary piston machine

Title (de)

Hydrostatische Kreiskolbenmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine hydrostatique à piston rotatif

Publication

EP 1074740 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115295 A

Priority

EP 99115295 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a displacement part (1) working with a centrally supported shaft (2). The displacement part has a first rigid casing part (4) with a first inner toothing, which co-operates with a rotatable eccentric rotary piston having an outer toothing with one more tooth than the first inner toothing. The rotary piston has a second inner toothing (8), which meshes with a second outer toothing (9) at the shaft, where the second inner toothing has two more teeth than the second outer toothing. Shaft bearings (10,11) are arranged directly on the left and right of the displacement part. A disc-shaped turning valve and an eccentric inner gear (12) are provided for the drive, where the inner gear guides the rotary valve in orbit about the machine axis of the eccentric movement.

Abstract (de)

Eine hydrostatische Kreiskolbenmaschine besitzt einen als An- bzw. Abtriebsteil wirkenden Verdrängerteil (1) und ein zur Versorgung und Entsorgung des Verdrängerteils (1) mit Arbeitsfluid dienendes Drehventil (3), wobei der Verdrängerteil (1) ein erstes starres Gehäuseteil (4) mit einer ersten Innenverzahnung (5) mit einer Zähnezahl d aufweist, die mit einer ersten, eine Zähnezahl c aufweisenden Aussenverzahnung (7) an einem drehbaren, exzentrisch angeordneten Kreiskolben (6) zusammenwirkt. Der Kreiskolben (6) weist eine zweite Innenverzahnung (8) mit einer Zähnezahl b auf, die mit einer zweiten, eine Zähnezahl a aufweisenden Aussenverzahnung (9) an einer zentrisch gelagerten Welle (2) kämmt. Dabei ist d - c = 1 und b - a = 2 ist. Wellenlager (10, 11) sind unmittelbar benachbart links und rechts am Verdrängerteil (1) angeordnet. Ein scheibenförmiges Drehventil (3) wird über ein Zahnradgetriebe angetrieben, das als Exzenter-Innengetriebe (12, 13) ausgebildet ist, bei dem das scheibenförmige Drehventil (3)im Orbit um die Maschinenachse die Exzenterbewegung ausführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/105 (2013.01); F04C 2/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074740 A1 20010207; EP 1074740 B1 20011219; DE 59900601 D1 20020131; DK 1074740 T3 20020415

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030803

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-09-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030803

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020905

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900601 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000226

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI