Global Patent Index - EP 1074746 A2

EP 1074746 A2 2001-02-07 - Turbo compressor

Title (en)

Turbo compressor

Title (de)

Turboverdichter

Title (fr)

Turbo-compresseur

Publication

EP 1074746 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810274 A

Priority

  • EP 00810274 A
  • EP 99810640 A

Abstract (en)

The turbocompressor has an electric motor (2), a multistage radial turbocompressor (3) and a common shaft (13), part of which forms the rotor (2B) of the electric motor and another the rotor of the radial turbocompressor. A housing consists of several sub-housings rigidly connected together, with the electric motor and radial turbocompressor each mounted in a separate sub-housing. The rotors can be connected to a common shaft via coupling (4) between the rotor of the electric motor and the compressor wheel (3b). An Independent claim is also included for a system containing a turbocompressor.

Abstract (de)

Der Turboverdichter (1) umfasst einen Elektromotor (2), einen mehrstufigen Radialturboverdichter (3) sowie eine gemeinsame Welle (13), wobei ein Teilabschnitt der Welle (13) als Rotor (2b) des Elektromotors (2) ausgebildet ist, und wobei ein weiterer Teilabschnitt der Welle (13) als Läufer (3e) des Radialturboverdichters (3) ausgebildet ist, wobei der Läufer (3e) eine Verdichterwelle (3a) sowie damit verbundene Verdichterräder (3b) umfasst, und wobei zum Lagern der Welle (13) mehrere elektromagnetische Radiallager (5) in Verlaufsrichtung der Welle (13) beabstandet angeordnet sind, und wobei zwischen dem Rotor (2b) des Elektromotors (2) und dem Verdichterrad (3b) ein einziges elektromagnetisches Radiallager (5) angeordnet ist, und wobei der Elektromotor (2), der Radialturboverdichter (3), die Welle (13) sowie die Radiallager (5) in einem gemeinsamen, nach aussen gasdichten Gehäuse (6) angeordnet sind, wobei das Gehäuse (6) aus mehreren Teilgehäusen (6e, 6f, 6g) besteht, welche fest miteinander verbindbar sind, dass der Elektromotor (2) in einem Teilgehäuse (6f) und der Radialturboverdichter (3) in einem Teilgehäuse (6e, 6g) angeordnet ist, und wobei der Rotor (2b) des Elektromotors (2) sowie der Läufer (3e) des Radialturboverdichters (3) über eine zwischen dem Rotor (2b) des Elektromotors (2) und dem Verdichterrad (3b) angeordnete Kupplung (4) zu einer gemeinsamen Welle (13) verbindbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/06; F04D 17/12; F04D 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/056 (2006.01); F04D 17/12 (2006.01); F04D 25/02 (2006.01); F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/044 (2006.01); F04D 29/058 (2006.01); F04D 29/10 (2006.01); F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/056 (2013.01); F04D 17/12 (2013.01); F04D 25/0606 (2013.01); F04D 25/0686 (2013.01); F04D 29/054 (2013.01); F04D 29/584 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3729486 C1 19881215 - GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20011219 U1 20001005; CA 2312081 A1 20010116; CA 2312081 C 20040302; CN 1153907 C 20040616; CN 1281101 A 20010124; EP 1074746 A2 20010207; EP 1074746 A3 20020515; EP 1074746 B1 20050518; JP 2001041191 A 20010213; JP 4460116 B2 20100512; KR 100779959 B1 20071128; KR 20010015305 A 20010226; US 6464469 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50010337

2014-07-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 295939 T

- Effective date: 20131127

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-22 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50010337

- Effective date: 20140522

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-11-27 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50010337

2013-11-27 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50010337

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAN TURBO A.G.

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ABT. CT IP PG

2006-04-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ABT. CT IP PG

- Effective date: 20060217

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-12-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-08-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010337 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBO AG

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 25/06 A, 7F 04D 17/12 B, 7F 04D 29/04 B, 7F 04D 29/10 B, 7F 04D 29/58 B

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG GHH BORSIG

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI