Global Patent Index - EP 1074749 A2

EP 1074749 A2 2001-02-07 - Press-block coupling for fluid circuits

Title (en)

Press-block coupling for fluid circuits

Title (de)

Spannblockkupplung für Druckmittelschaltkreise

Title (fr)

Accouplement à bloque de serrage pour les circuits fluidiques

Publication

EP 1074749 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00116843 A

Priority

IT TO990698 A

Abstract (en)

A press-block coupling for fluid circuits, comprising: a base body (12) provided with a first opening (16), designed to be connected to a branch of a fluid circuit, and with a second opening (20), designed to establish a fluid connection with a corresponding opening of a complementary coupling; and at least one main valve element (26) which can slide in the base body (12) and co-operates with a valve seat (24) designed to activate or interrupt fluid connection between the first opening (16) and the second opening (20). The press-block coupling comprises an auxiliary valve element (58) with mechanical opening, set in such a way that, in use, following upon mechanical opening of the auxiliary valve element (58), a variation in pressure is produced in said main chamber (18) such as to bring about opening of the main valve element (26) under the action of the pressure of the fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00; F16L 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0807 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074749 A2 20010207; EP 1074749 A3 20021002; EP 1074749 B1 20040414; DE 60009809 D1 20040519; DE 60009809 T2 20050331; IT 1310675 B1 20020219; IT TO990698 A1 20010206; IT TO990698 D0 19990806

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-03-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040804

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009809 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERLO PROJECT S.R.L.

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI