Global patent index - EP 1074789 A2

EP 1074789 A2 2001-02-07 - Propulsion steam nozzle

Title (en)

Propulsion steam nozzle

Title (de)

Treibdampfdüse

Title (fr)

Buse pour vapeur de propulsion

Publication

EP 1074789 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115869 A

Priority

DE 19936125 A

Abstract (en)

The booster-type steam nozzle (10) has a central steam-inlet (20). At least two Laval or Venturi nozzles (30) peripherally distributed and aligned at a first angle at a slat to the lengthwise axis (L) of the steam nozzle . A cool water inlet (40) has at least one branch duct (42) at a second angle at a slant to the lengthwise axis of the steam nozzle and into which the Laval or Venturi nozzles open. The Laval or Venturi nozzles on at least one circle arc are positioned in a core body (12) enclosed in a covering body (14) and open at one end-side into a central hole (22) in the core body. The central hole forms part of the booster-type steam inlet.

Abstract (de)

Eine Treibdampfdüse (10) hat zur optimierten Reduzierung bzw. Regelung der Temperatur von Heißdampfströmen in wärmetechnischen Anlagen in einem Gehäuse (11) eine zentrische Treibdampfzuführung (20), wenigstens zwei in äquidistanten Abständen auf einem konzentrisch zur Längsachse (L) der Treibdampfdüse (10) ausgerichteten Kreisbogen angeordnete Lavaldüsen (30), die in einem ersten Winkel () schräg zur Längsachse (L) der Treibdampfdüse (10) ausgerichtet sind, sowie eine Kühlwasserzuführung (40), die mit wenigstens je einem in einem zweiten Winkel () schräg zur Längsachse (L) der Treibdampfdüse (10) ausgerichteten Stichkanal (42) in den Lavaldüsen (30) mündet. Das Gehäuse (11) wird von einem Hüllkörper (14) sowie von einem darin eingesetzten Kernkörper (12) gebildet, in dem sowohl die Lavaldüsen (30) als auch die Stichkanäle (42) ausgebildet sind. Die Lavaldüsen (30) sind konzentrisch zur Längsachse (L) von einem Ringspalt (50) umgeben, der stirnseitig zwischen dem Kernkörper (12) und dem Hüllkörper (14) ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22G 5/123 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936125 A1 20010201; AT 305116 T 20051015; DE 29924806 U1 20051229; DE 50011199 D1 20051027; DK 1074789 T3 20060206; EP 1074789 A2 20010207; EP 1074789 A3 20030326; EP 1074789 B1 20050921; EP 1074789 B8 20051123

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TEC ARTEC GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20120821

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20130605

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-06-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

2012-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OLBRICHT, BUCHHOLD, KEULERTZ PA, DE

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 305116

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110724

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100724

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060724

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ARTEC ARMATUREN- UND ANLAGENTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2006-04-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050921

2006-02-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-02-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-01-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-12-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-10-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: JAEKEL, HORST

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-09-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI