Global Patent Index - EP 1074798 A2

EP 1074798 A2 2001-02-07 - Conditioning apparatus

Title (en)

Conditioning apparatus

Title (de)

Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1074798 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306652 A

Priority

GB 9918637 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to apparatus for providing conditioning medium in a space having at least opposed boundary walls and a base, characterised by inlet means (5) positioned to direct conditioning medium into the space (2), and by the inlet means (5) comprising a plurality of elongate inlets (6, 7, 8) which are spaced apart vertically and extend over a desired length of a boundary wall (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 2013/088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074798 A2 20010207; EP 1074798 A3 20030312; GB 2352799 A 20010207; GB 2352799 B 20040310; GB 9918637 D0 19991013

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/06 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 3/36 B

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUKE, NEVILLE CHARLES

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURFOOT, DEAN

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHOU, QUANBAO

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI