Global patent index - EP 1074802 A2

EP 1074802 A2 2001-02-07 - Refrigerator with compartment for the quick cooling of food

Title (en)

Refrigerator with compartment for the quick cooling of food

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Fach zur Lebensmittelschnellkühlung

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur à compartiment à refroidissement rapide de produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 1074802 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202389 A

Priority

IT MI991771 A

Abstract (en)

Home refrigerator comprising at least one freezer compartment (1) and at least one compartment (2; 2, 50) at a temperature higher than the freezer compartment (1) and comprising a refrigeration circuit (8) with relative condenser (12), compressor (9), evaporator (7) and fan (14). Such refrigerator comprises at least one small size compartment (16) that gets cold quickly by means of a circulation of air that is forced by the fan (14) through the evaporator (7) and inside said at least one small size compartment (16) and said at least one compartment (2; 2, 50) at a temperature higher than the freezer compartment (1) by means of opportune inlet openings (81, 83-84; 81, 83; 81, 83-51) whose closing and opening is controlled by valve means (18, 20-21; 18, 20; 18, 20-52) that are controlled thermostatically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/02; F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/02 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01); F25D 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/02 (2013.01); F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F25D 23/12 (2013.01); F25D 2317/061 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0653 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0661 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01); F25D 2400/28 (2013.01); F25D 2400/30 (2013.01); F25D 2700/12 (2013.01); F25D 2700/121 (2013.01); F25D 2700/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074802 A2 20010207; EP 1074802 A3 20010620; EP 1074802 B1 20050608; DE 60020647 D1 20050714; DE 60020647 T2 20060504; ES 2243194 T3 20051201; IT 1313157 B1 20020617; IT MI991771 A1 20010205; IT MI991771 D0 19990805

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080706

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2243194

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020647

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040210

2002-03-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI