Global Patent Index - EP 1074805 A1

EP 1074805 A1 2001-02-07 - Process for producing oxygen under pressure and device therefor

Title (en)

Process for producing oxygen under pressure and device therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Sauerstoff unter überatmosphärischem Druck

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'oxygène sous pression

Publication

EP 1074805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118724 A

Priority

DE 19936816 A

Abstract (en)

A cryogenic rectification process and assembly extract oxygen from air at above ambient atmospheric pressure. The rectification has one or more pressurized columns (13) and a low pressure column (14). Incoming ambient process air (1) is compressed to a first pressure (3) which is approximately the same as that of the pressurized column (13). A portion (11) of the pressurized incoming ambient air (7) is fed to a heat exchanger (8) and cooled prior to release in the pressurized column (13). A flow of oxygen (31) is drawn from the low pressure column (14) and brought to a pressure which is higher than that of the operating pressure in the low pressure column (14). This gas (31) is then heated in the main heat exchanger (8) and discharged as the product (34). A process flow (21) is allowed to expand (22) yielding energy, and is then charged (23) into the low-pressure column (14). A portion of the energy yielded (22) is used to power a cold compressor (16). Especially, the flow of oxygen (31) from the low-pressure column (14) is brought to the release pressure (32) in liquid form, and evaporated by an indirect exchange of heat (18) with a second portion (12, 17) of compressed ambient air (7). The second portion (12) of compressed (3) air is then further compressed by the cold compressor (16) upstream of the indirect heat exchanger (18).

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Vorrichtung dienen zur Gewinnung von Sauerstoff unter überatmosphärischem Druck durch Tieftemperatur-Luftzerlegung in einem Rektifiziersystem, das mindestens eine Drucksäule (13) und eine Niederdrucksäule (14) aufweist. Einsatzluft (1) wird auf einen ersten Druck verdichtet (3), der etwa gleich dem Betriebsdruck der Drucksäule (13) ist. Mindestens ein erster Teilstrom (11) der Einsatzluft (7) wird unter dem ersten Druck in einem Hauptwärmetauscher (8) abgekühlt und in die Drucksäule (13) eingeleitet. Der Niederdrucksäule (14) wird ein Sauerstoffstrom (31) entnommen, auf einen Abgabedruck, der höher als der Betriebsdruck der Niederdrucksäule (14) ist, gebracht (32), im Hauptwärmetauscher (8) angewärmt und als Produkt (34) abgeführt. Ein Prozeßstrom (21) wird arbeitsleistend entspannt (22) und in die Niederdrucksäule (14) eingespeist (23), wobei mindestens ein Teil der bei der arbeitsleistenden Entspannung (22) erzeugten mechanischen Energie zum Antrieb eines Kaltverdichters (16) verwendet wird. Der Sauerstoffstrom (31) aus der Niederdrucksäule (14) wird im flüssigen Zustand auf den Abgabedruck gebracht (32) und durch indirekten Wärmeaustausch (18) mit einem zweiten Teilstrom (12, 17) der auf den ersten Druck verdichteten Einsatzluft (7) verdampft. Der zweite Teilstrom (12) wird stromaufwärts des indirekten Wärmeaustauschs (18) mittels des Kaltverdichters (16) auf einen zweiten Druck gebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04206 (2013.01); F25J 3/04054 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 2250/40 (2013.01); F25J 2250/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074805 A1 20010207; EP 1074805 B1 20050119; AT 287518 T 20050215; DE 19936816 A1 20010208; ES 2237008 T3 20050716; US 6332337 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2013-10-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 287518 T

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-06-05 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110923

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110923

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 287518 T

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911495

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-08-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.LEOPOLDSTRASSE 252, D-80807 MüNCHEN

- Effective date: 20050119

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DESURV

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237008 T3

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-05-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911495 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI