Global Patent Index - EP 1074807 A2

EP 1074807 A2 2001-02-07 - Folded tube for a heat exchanger and method of making same

Title (en)

Folded tube for a heat exchanger and method of making same

Title (de)

Gebogenes Rohr für Wärmetauscher und dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tube plié pour échangeur de chaleur et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1074807 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305595 A

Priority

US 36503099 A

Abstract (en)

A folded tube (12) and method of making the same for a heat exchanger (10) includes a base (24), a top (26) spaced from and opposing the base (24), a first side (28) interposed between the base (24) and the top (26) along one side thereof, and a second side (30) interposed between the base (24) and the top (26) along another side thereof. The folded tube (12) includes at least one of the base (24) and the top (26) having at least one internal web (40) having an initial web height and being compressed to extend the at least one internal web to a final web height greater than the initial web height and defining a plurality of fluid ports (42). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03; F28F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/02 (2006.01); B21C 37/15 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/042 (2013.01); B21C 37/151 (2013.01); F28D 1/0391 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49391 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5386629 A 19950207 - OUCHI WATARU [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074807 A2 20010207; EP 1074807 A3 20010411; KR 20010021166 A 20010315; US 6209202 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090203

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061222

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010915

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 28D 1/03 A, 7F 28F 3/04 B, 7B 21C 37/08 B, 7B 21C 37/15 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI