Global Patent Index - EP 1074808 A2

EP 1074808 A2 2001-02-07 - Block manifold for heat exchanger battery fan coils

Title (en)

Block manifold for heat exchanger battery fan coils

Title (de)

Verteilerblock für Wärmetauscher mit Rohrschlange und Lüfter

Title (fr)

Bloc collecteur pour batterie d'échange de chaleur à serpentin et ventilateur

Publication

EP 1074808 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830500 A

Priority

IT BS990076 U

Abstract (en)

The finding concerns a block manifold for heat exchanger battery fan coils. Its body has a fitting (12) with a fluid pipe for connection to a heat exchanger battery, two three or more branches (13) for connection to the pipes of the heat exchanger battery and an intermediate distribution chamber (14) to connect the fitting (12) up with the branches (13). This said intermediate chamber (14) is circular, completely closed all round and is coaxial with the said union part (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 27/02 (2013.01); F28F 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074808 A2 20010207; EP 1074808 A3 20041006; EP 1074808 B1 20051109; AT 309515 T 20051115; DE 60023805 D1 20051215; EP 1553378 A2 20050713; IT 247373 Y1 20020709; IT BS990076 U1 20010202; IT BS990076 V0 19990802

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AERMEC S.P.A.

2013-10-16 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20131202

2010-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GNUTTI CIRILLO S.P.A.

2010-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GNUTTI CIRILLO S.P.A.

2007-04-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 01/2006: PATENTNUMBER 1074808 SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 20060104/01)

2006-02-01 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EPO THAT PROCEEDINGS WERE STAYED BEFORE THE DATE OF GRANT OF THE PATENT. THIS CORRECTION WAS PUBLISHED IN EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 06/01 DATED 20060104

2006-01-04 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023805 P 20051215

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GNUTTI CIRILLO SPA

2005-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI