Global Patent Index - EP 1074809 A1

EP 1074809 A1 2001-02-07 - Firearm with a device for verifying the authorisation of a person

Title (en)

Firearm with a device for verifying the authorisation of a person

Title (de)

Feuerwaffe mit einer Vorrichtung zur Prüfung der Berechtigung einer Person

Title (fr)

Arme à feu pourvue d'un système d'autorisation

Publication

EP 1074809 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00202601 A

Priority

BE 9900540 A

Abstract (en)

The gun is fired by a trigger (2) in the usual way. A lever (3), connected to the trigger, may be blocked by a unit (10) with an electrical command device (10A), connected to a control circuit (9). The transmitter receiver device (6) in the gun is in two-way communication with a second transmitter-receiver (13) in an identification unit carried by the user. The unit may act as a transponder and a circuit (8) in the gun calculates the distance of the identification unit from the delay in returning the signal. Excessive distance may lead to the gun being locked out of action.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une arme à feu pourvue d'un système d'autorisation qui comprend un émetteur-récepteur (6) d'ondes untrasoniques monté sur l'arme, une unité (5) à porter par le tireur, comprenant des moyens (13) pour renvoyer un signal émis par l'émetteur-récepteur (6) susdit à ce dernier et un dispositif de contrôle (9) contrôlant le signal reçu par la partie réceptrice susdite, commandant un dispositif (10) pouvant empêcher le tir. Le système d'autorisation comprend un compteur de temps (7) pouvant compter le temps écoulé entre l'émission d'un signal par l'émetteur-récepteur (6) et sa réception par ce dernier et un dispositif de calcul (8) déterminant la distance parcourue par ce signal, le dispositif de contrôle (9) ne permettant le tir que lorsqu'il a reconnu le signal et qu'en plus la distance susdite est inférieure à un seuil déterminé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/58 (2006.01); F41A 17/00 (2006.01); F41A 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5704153 A 19980106 - KAMINSKI KEVIN A [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074809 A1 20010207; AU 5052700 A 20010208; AU 767816 B2 20031127; BE 1013085 A3 20010904; BR 0003347 A 20010313; CA 2316670 A1 20010206; CZ 20002773 A3 20010516; CZ 294835 B6 20050316; HU 0002910 A2 20010428; HU 0002910 A3 20020228; HU 0002910 D0 20000928; IL 137501 A 20030731; IL 137501 D0 20010724; JP 2001074393 A 20010323; PL 341854 A1 20010212; TW 544507 B 20030801; US 6314671 B1 20011113; ZA 200003915 B 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036650

2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021023

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI