Global Patent Index - EP 1074838 A2

EP 1074838 A2 2001-02-07 - Apparatus for investigating the behaviour of environmental chemicals under natural conditions

Title (en)

Apparatus for investigating the behaviour of environmental chemicals under natural conditions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung des Verhaltens von Umweltchemikalien unter natürlichen Bedingungen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'étude du comportement de substances chimiques environnementales dans des conditions naturelles

Publication

EP 1074838 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110049 A

Priority

DE 19935133 A

Abstract (en)

The lysimeter arrangement comprises a container filled with earth and a volatility chamber arranged above the surface of the earth. The volatility chamber determines the volatile compounds from a defined earth partial region. Preferred Arrangement: The arrangement further comprises a plant chamber which determines the volatile compounds form plant surfaces. A wash bottle with a cooling zone is provided for scrubbing the air from the volatility chamber and/or the plant chamber. The environmental chemicals are radioactively marked, especially with <14>C.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung des Verhaltens und des Abbaus von Umweltchemikalien im geschlossenen System, wobei die Vorrichtung mindestens ein im wesentlichen mit Boden gefülltes Behältnis, den Lysimeter, und eine oberhalb der Bodenoberfläche angeordnete Volatilitätskammer umfaßt, wobei die Volatitätskammer die flüchtigen Verbindungen aus einem definierten Bodenteilbereich erfaßt. Vorzugsweise umfaßt die Vorrichtung zusätzlich eine Pflanzenkammer, die flüchtige Verbindungen von einer ausgewählten Pflanze aus dem Pflanzenbestand erfaßt. Das erfindungsgemäße Testsystem (Lysimeteranlage) ermöglicht die Bestimmung der Verlagerung, des Transports, der Auswaschung, der Umwandlung (Metabolisierung), der Minerialisierung und der Verflüchtigung von Chemikalien unter natürlichen Klimabedingungen sowohl ohne den Einfluß von Pflanzen als auch unter dem Einfluß von Pflanzen in der im Lysimeter enthaltenen Bodensäule sowie die Mineralisierung und Verflüchtigung von Chemikalien unter natürlichen Klimabedingungen von Pflanzenoberflächen. Die Erfindung betrifft auch ein Verfahren zur Testung von Chemikalien in Böden unter Verwendung der erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/24; G01N 33/00; G01N 33/497

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/24 (2006.01); G01N 33/497 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/0098 (2013.01); G01N 33/24 (2013.01); G01N 2033/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074838 A2 20010207; EP 1074838 A3 20010816; DE 19935133 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030918

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20011106;LV PAYMENT 20011106;SI PAYMENT 20011106

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/24 A, 7G 01N 33/00 B, 7G 01N 33/497 B, 7G 01N 1/00 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI