Global Patent Index - EP 1074898 A1

EP 1074898 A1 2001-02-07 - Audio-light device for small instruments

Title (en)

Audio-light device for small instruments

Title (de)

Audiolichtgerät für kleine Instrumente

Title (fr)

Dispositif audio-lumineux pour instrument de petit volume

Publication

EP 1074898 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99115602 A

Priority

EP 99115602 A

Abstract (en)

The audio lighting unit (1) has a light (4) and sound alarm (5) controlled by a microprocessor to sound the alarm (6) and to illuminate the message (2) on the watch face (3) for scheduled events or on the arrival of external messages with the light and alarm prevented from simultaneous operation or operating in rapid alternation.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif audio-lumineux (1) accompagne un message (2) affiché sur le cadran (3) d'une montre. Ce dispositif comporte une source lumineuse (4) pour éclairer le message, une source sonore (5) pour attirer l'attention du porteur, et un dispositif de commande (6) destiné à composer le message et à exciter les sources lumineuse et sonore selon un programme prédéterminé. Le dispositif de commande (6) est arrangé pour empêcher l'alimentation simultanée de la source lumineuse et de la source sonore. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00; G08B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 11/00 (2006.01); G08B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/06 (2013.01); G04G 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0468726 A2 19920129 - NEC CORP [JP]
  • [A] US 4388000 A 19830614 - HAGIHIRA TOURU [JP]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 001, no. 142 (E - 065) 18 November 1977 (1977-11-18)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 156 (P - 135) 17 August 1982 (1982-08-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 002, no. 073 (E - 037) 7 June 1978 (1978-06-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 042 (P - 053) 20 March 1981 (1981-03-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074898 A1 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI