Global Patent Index - EP 1074950 A2

EP 1074950 A2 2001-02-07 - Automatic and multiple introduction system to be applied to automatic equipment for machines as lottomatic and similar

Title (en)

Automatic and multiple introduction system to be applied to automatic equipment for machines as lottomatic and similar

Title (de)

Automatisches Mehrfachzuführungssystem für automatische Geräte wie Lottoscheinannahmegeräte und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Système automatique à multiples introductions pour application aux équipements automatiques pour machines de loterie et similaires

Publication

EP 1074950 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830369 A

Priority

IT RI990002 A

Abstract (en)

The patent accelerates the use of automatic equipment utilized in the electronic data processing of pre-compiled coupons, consisting of an automatic and multiple loading and insertion drawer of the pre-compiled coupons to be applied on the insertion point of these coupons, with a recovery holder of the electronically elaborated coupons and relative betting slips, to be applied on the respective points of both exits. Such system is applicable to the processors in use in the lottomatic and similar betting offices. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074950 A2 20010207; EP 1074950 A3 20020130; IT 1314666 B1 20021231; IT RI990002 A1 20010205; IT RI990002 D0 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07C 15/00 A, 7G 07B 11/02 B, 7A 63F 3/06 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI